EP3990456 - CXCR4 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X4 Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 955 Massachusetts Avenue 4th Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURQUE, Elyse Marie Josee 162 Ch Bouffard L'Etang-du-Nord Québec G4T3G6 / CA | 02 /
SKERLJ, Renato 12 Crocker Circle West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20830551.6 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US39816 | Priority number, date | US201962867003P | 26.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962867003 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020264292 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990456 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D519/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | CXCR4-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/18] | English: | CXCR4 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2022/18] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CXCR4 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 13.08.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.09.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/22] | 01.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005059702 (BRIDGER GARY J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 , 23 * , entire document *; | [X]US2005154201 (CHEN GANG [CA], et al) [X] 1, 23 * , especially para [0021] and para [0062]-[0066] *; | [A]WO2017223229 (X4 PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-3, 23* , entire document *; | [X] - Anonymous, "Compound Summary for CID68972701", PubChem Compound, (20121130), Database accession no. CID68972701, URL: NCBI, XP055780389 [X] 1-3 * , especially p.2 formula * | [A] - Anonymous, "Compound Summary for CID68971863", PubChem COMPOUND, (20121130), Database accession no. CID68971863, URL: NCBI, XP055780391 [A] 1-3 * , especially p.2 formula * |