EP3992291 - NOVEL COMPOUND AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kylonova (Xiamen) Biopharma Co., Ltd. CHEN, Qingyan Room 302, No. 120, Xin Yuan Rd., Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Xueqin LU, Xueqin Room 302, No. 120, Xin Yuan Rd., Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 02 /
MU, Zhuo MU, Zhuo Room 302, No. 120, Xin Yuan Rd., Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shengjun WANG, Shengjun Room 302, No. 120, Xin Yuan Rd., Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 04 /
DU, Yanchun DU, Yanchun Room 302, No. 120, Xin Yuan Rd., Haicang District Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20830838.7 | 23.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN97732 | Priority number, date | CN201910576037 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910576037 | CN201911281389 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911281389 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259497 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992291 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713, A61P1/16 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N15/113 (CN,KR);
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (CN,KR);
A61K47/545 (US);
A61K47/549 (EP);
A61K47/55 (US);
A61P31/20 (US);
C12N2310/11 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNG UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/18] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUND AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2022/18] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ ET SON APPLICATION | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2022 | Translation filed | 27.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009073809 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 12 - page 20; examples 11,22 * * page 124 - page 125; figures 2,7,11,26,27; claims 1-3,14-16 *; | [A]WO2016077321 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-18,58-86; sequences 369,409 *; | [A]WO2018027106 (ARROWHEAD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * examples 3,4; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]WO2018185253 (SILENCE THERAPEUTICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * page 75; figures 2,3,5,7-12; claims 1-9,39 *; | [A]US2018371463 (LIMPHONG PATTRARANEE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-22,33,37; sequences 683,686 *; | [A] - JAYAPRAKASH K. NAIR ET AL, "Multivalent N -Acetylgalactosamine-Conjugated siRNA Localizes in Hepatocytes and Elicits Robust RNAi-Mediated Gene Silencing", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20141210), vol. 136, no. 49, doi:10.1021/ja505986a, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 16958 - 16961, XP055181463 [A] 1-12 * Scheme 1;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja505986a | [A] - VIVEK K. SHARMA ET AL, "Novel Cluster and Monomer-Based GalNAc Structures Induce Effective Uptake of siRNAs in Vitro and in Vivo", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, US, (20180613), vol. 29, no. 7, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.8b00365, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2478 - 2488, XP055556649 [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.8b00365 | [A] - WANYI TAI, "Current Aspects of siRNA Bioconjugate for In Vitro and In Vivo Delivery", MOLECULES, (20190613), vol. 24, no. 12, doi:10.3390/molecules24122211, page 2211, XP055636943 [A] 1-12 * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/molecules24122211 | International search | [A]CN102869774 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]WO2015188194 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-12* entire document *; | [A]WO2017027350 (ARROWHEAD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [A]CN106434665 (ARROWHEAD RES CORP) [A] 1-12 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108064294 (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1, 18 *; | [Y]CN109331185 (KYLONOVA XIAMEN BIOPHARMA CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1-5, 8-16 *; | [PX]CN110218728 (KYLONOVA XIAMEN BIOPHARMA CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * entire document *; | [PX]CN110846320 (KYLONOVA XIAMEN BIOPHARMA CO LTD) [PX] 1-12 * claims 1-12 * | by applicant | - ASHWELL GSHARFORD J, "Carbohydrate specific Receptors of the Liver", Ann Rev Biochem, (19820000), vol. 51, pages 531 - 554 |