EP3991055 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SECURING A DRUG THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmaccx, Inc. 200 Portland Street Boston MA 02114 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLAKHYAN, Armen 200 Portland Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
RICE, Peter 200 Portland Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | 03 /
BERGSTRÖM, Richard 200 Portland Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Patrick 200 Portland Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | 05 /
BOSKEY, Cole 55 Traveler Street Apt. 707 Boston, MA 02118 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Harden, Henry Simon, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20831045.8 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US39876 | Priority number, date | US201962867014P | 26.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962867014 P | US201962947453P | 12.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962947453 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020264338 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991055 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/178, G06Q10/08, G16H20/10, G06Q50/18 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0234 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G06F16/258 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0206 (EP,US);
G16H20/10 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G16H50/70 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G06F16/178, G06Q10/08, G16H20/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG EINER MEDIKAMENTENTHERAPIE | [2022/18] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SECURING A DRUG THERAPY | [2022/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SÉCURISATION D'UNE THÉRAPIE MÉDICAMENTEUSE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007162303 (WILEY JOSEPH L II [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] - [0017]; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]US2017061102 (WEBER GRIFFIN M [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 70] , [0112] - [0137] - [ 146] * | International search | [YA]MXPA04008737 (M S IND SWIFT LTD [IN]) [Y] 5-9 * ; see machine translation. * [A] 10-14; | [YA]US2011054935 (HARDAWAY JASON MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 2-9 * ; paragraphs [0053], [0057], [0058], [0173]. * [A] 10-14; | [A]WO2014151911 (MEDIMPACT HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-14* ; entire document. *; | [XYA]US2018330060 (BILES BRANDON [US], et al) [X] 1 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0050], [0051], [0073], [0105]; claims 1, 11, 12. * [Y] 2-9 [A] 10-14 |