EP3992043 - WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/18] | WORK MACHINE | ||
[2024/04] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUBOTA CORPORATION 1-2-47, Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5568601 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMBA Daiki c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | 02 /
YAMANAKA Yukifumi c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho, 64 Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20831186.0 | 24.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24731 | Priority number, date | JP20190122521 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122521 | JP20190122522 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122522 | JP20190122523 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122523 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262428 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992043 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/08, B60K6/485, B60W20/00, F02D29/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
E02F9/0866 (EP);
E02F3/3414 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP);
B60W10/08 (EP);
B60W20/00 (EP);
E02F9/2075 (EP,US);
E02F9/2246 (EP,US);
E02F9/2253 (EP,US);
E02F9/2285 (EP,US);
E02F9/2289 (EP);
E02F9/2292 (US);
E02F9/2296 (EP);
F02D29/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/18] | English: | WORKING MACHINE | [2024/04] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2022/18] |
Former [2022/18] | WORK MACHINE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2021 | Translation filed | 01.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 05.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017362799 (NAKAGAWA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]EP3266942 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY TIERRA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 5-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] , [0055] , [0056]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP3336264 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 5-7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0022] , [0027] , [0038] - [0042] - [0068]; figures 1,2,3b * | International search | [YA]JP2016153268 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [Y] 5, 7-8 * paragraphs [0025]-[0028], [0033], fig. 1 * [A] 1-4, 6, 9-14; | [YA]JP2017226284 (KUBOTA KK) [Y] 5, 7-8 * abstract, paragraphs [0012]-[0015], [0021], [0024]-[0025], [0027]-[0028], [0037]-[0046], fig. 1-3, 7, 10 * [A] 1-4, 6, 9-14; | [A]JP2018090125 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 6, 9 * abstract, fig. 2 *; | [Y]JP2018154970 (KUBOTA KK) [Y] 7-8 * paragraphs [0032]-[0036], fig. 1-2 *; | [A]WO2019074301 (DOOSAN INFRACORE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0009]-[0015], [0025]-[0042], fig. 1 * | by applicant | WO2014136834 |