EP3992146 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBONYL SULFIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUURA, Go c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20831279.3 | 22.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24447 | Priority number, date | JP20190119959 | 27.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019119959 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262319 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992146 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/77, H01L21/311 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C01B32/77 (EP,CN,KR);
C25B3/07 (US);
C07C305/14 (US);
C25B15/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | C01B32/77 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONYLSULFID | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBONYL SULFIDE | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SULFURE DE CARBONYLE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | Translation filed | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 25.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR100938435B (WONIK MATERIALS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN108786665 (FUJIAN JIUCE GAS GROUP CO LTD); | International search | [A]JPS615409B ; | [A]WO2004089824 (FINK WINSTON DAVID [ZA]); | [A]WO2012144441 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012224494 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [A]US2012289439 (MESTERS CAROLUS MATTHIAS ANNA MARIA [US], et al); | [A]JP2014020812 (TAIYO NIPPON SANSO CORP); | [A]JP2018519414 ; | by applicant | JPS4740632B | US3409399 | JPS52131993 |