EP3991901 - REPAIR WELDING SYSTEM, REPAIR WELDING METHOD, INSPECTION DEVICE, AND ROBOT CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Takamichi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MOHRI, Toshinari c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
MONDEN, Ryutaro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20831448.4 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24242 | Priority number, date | JP20190122372 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122372 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262260 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991901 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/095, B23K9/12, B23K31/00, B23K9/173, B23K26/21 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B23K31/125 (EP,US);
B23K9/095 (CN);
B23K26/21 (EP);
B23K31/00 (CN);
B23K9/0956 (EP,US);
B23K9/12 (CN);
B23K9/173 (EP);
B25J11/005 (US);
B25J9/1687 (US);
G05B19/0425 (EP);
G05B2219/32228 (EP);
G05B2219/32231 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | B23K9/095, B23K9/12, B23K31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | REPARATURSCHWEISSSYSTEM, REPARATURSCHWEISSVERFAHREN, INSPEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND ROBOTERSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | REPAIR WELDING SYSTEM, REPAIR WELDING METHOD, INSPECTION DEVICE, AND ROBOT CONTROL DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOUDAGE DE RÉPARATION, PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE DE RÉPARATION, DISPOSITIF D'INSPECTION ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE ROBOT | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2021 | Translation filed | 21.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000167666 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2006247663 (CHUO MOTOR WHEEL CO LTD, et al); | [XI]US2010314362 (ALBRECHT BRUCE PATRICK [US]) | International search | [XY]JP2000167666 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-2, 4, 6-7, 9-12 * , paragraphs [0014], [0018]-[0077], fig. 1-25 * [Y] 8; | [Y]JP2006247663 (CHUO MOTOR WHEEL CO LTD, et al) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0004], [0025] *; | [A]JP2010253538 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0027]-[0061], fig. 1-15 * | by applicant | JP2012037487 | JP2019122372 |