EP3990928 - MAGNETIC PUCK FOR TRANSPORTING SAMPLE CONTAINERS IN A CLINICAL CHEMISTRY ANALYZER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics, Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAO, Simin 129 Holly Lane Boonton TWP, NJ 07005 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20831833.7 | 24.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US39325 | Priority number, date | US201962866871P | 26.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962866871 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020263951 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990928 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3990928 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/04, G01N35/10, B01L3/00, B01L9/06, B65G1/00 | [2022/32] | CPC: |
B01L9/06 (EP,US);
G01N35/026 (US);
B01L3/50 (US);
B01L3/5082 (EP);
G01N35/04 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2300/0851 (EP);
B65G2201/0261 (EP);
G01N2035/0406 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0477 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G01N35/04, G01N35/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETPUCK ZUM TRANSPORT VON PROBENBEHÄLTERN IN EINEM KLINISCH-CHEMISCHEN ANALYSEGERÄT | [2022/18] | English: | MAGNETIC PUCK FOR TRANSPORTING SAMPLE CONTAINERS IN A CLINICAL CHEMISTRY ANALYZER SYSTEM | [2022/18] | French: | BLOC MAGNÉTIQUE POUR TRANSPORTER DES RÉCIPIENTS D'ÉCHANTILLON DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ANALYSEUR DE CHIMIE CLINIQUE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2023 | CZ | 11.10.2023 | DK | 11.10.2023 | EE | 11.10.2023 | ES | 11.10.2023 | HR | 11.10.2023 | IT | 11.10.2023 | LT | 11.10.2023 | LV | 11.10.2023 | NL | 11.10.2023 | PL | 11.10.2023 | RO | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SE | 11.10.2023 | SK | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | BG | 11.01.2024 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | PT | 12.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
CZ | 11.10.2023 | ||
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
EE | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RO | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
DK | 11.10.2023 | ||
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
SM | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
HR | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
LV | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
PL | 11.10.2023 | ||
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
SE | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 11.10.2023 | |
ES | 11.10.2023 | ||
LT | 11.10.2023 | ||
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
PT | 12.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 11.10.2023 | |
NL | 11.10.2023 | ||
BG | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 11.10.2023 | |
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 11.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS57144062U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,4 * * page 2 - page 3 * [A] 3-14; | [IA]US2014358036 (HOLMES ELIZABETH A [US]) [I] 1,2 * figure 41 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0446] * * paragraph [0461] - paragraph [0464] * [A] 3-14; | [A]WO2015126839 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract * | International search | [A]US2008307117 (MULLER-COHN JUDY [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0021], para [0053] *; | [A]US2013126302 (JOHNS CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0007], para [0023], para [0028], para [0036], para [0037], fig. 4 *; | [A]US2013125675 (MUELLER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 10-18 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0009], para [0086], para [0092], para [0093] *; | [A]US2015122614 (DUMITRESCU NICOLAE [US]) [A] 10-18* ; entire document, but especially: para [0006] *; | [A]US2018252737 (GEMPERLE SABRINA [CH], et al) [A] 1-9 * ; entire document, but especially: para [0007], para [0021], para [0024], para [0036], para [0050], para [0110] * | by applicant | JPS57144062U | US2014358036 |