EP3979530 - POLAR CODE RETRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Zhaoyang College Of Information Science And Electronic Engineering, Zhejiang University No. 38 Zheda Road, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310027 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Yunmei College Of Information Science And Electronic Engineering, Zhejiang University No. 38 Zheda Road, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310027 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Deng College Of Information Science And Electronic Engineering, Zhejiang University No. 38 Zheda Road, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310027 / CN | 04 /
QIN, Kangjian College Of Information Science And Electronic Engineering, Zhejiang University No. 38 Zheda Road, West Lake District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310027 / CN | 05 /
YU, Tianhang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/14] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/14] | Application number, filing date | 20832093.7 | 01.06.2020 | [2022/14] | WO2020CN93771 | Priority number, date | CN201910580513 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: CN201910580513 | [2022/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020259222 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3979530 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L1/1812, // H04L1/1829 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H04L1/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/0052 (CN);
H04L1/1812 (CN,US);
H04L1/1819 (EP);
H04L1/0068 (EP);
H04L1/1845 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | H04L1/00, H04L1/18 | ||
Former IPC [2022/14] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/14] | Title | German: | POLARCODENEUÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/14] | English: | POLAR CODE RETRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RETRANSMISSION DE CODE POLAIRE | [2022/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2021 | Translation filed | 27.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/14] | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018201481 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019095190 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | International search | [X]WO2018126906 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2018126906 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al); | [X]CN108886421 (QUALCOMM INC); | [A]CN108886421 (QUALCOMM INC); | [X]CN109863705 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN109863705 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); |