EP3990129 - ARTICULATED HARNESS CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT WITH INTEGRATED ATTACHMENT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MSA Technology, LLC 1000 Cranberry Woods Drive Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONAHAN, Michael, D. 1840 Allison Avenue Allison Park, Pennsylvania 15101 / US | 02 /
HALL, Mark 445 Old Mill Road Natrona Heights, Pennsylvania 15065 / US | 03 /
FERREIRA DODGE, Eduardo, José SHIN, Qi 1, conjunto 6, casa 24, Lago Norte 71505-060 Brasilia, DF / BR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Holzwarth-Rochford, Andreas Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Cordy, Nicole Jessica Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 20832315.4 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US39731 | Priority number, date | US201962868487P | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962868487 P | US202016911506 | 25.06.2020 Original published format: US202016911506 | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020264238 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990129 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00, A44B11/25 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A44B11/2519 (EP);
A62B35/0025 (US);
A44B11/006 (US);
A44B11/2546 (EP);
A62B35/0018 (EP,US);
A62B35/0037 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | A62B35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | GELENKIGE KABELBAUMVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEM BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT | [2022/18] | English: | ARTICULATED HARNESS CONNECTION ARRANGEMENT WITH INTEGRATED ATTACHMENT ELEMENT | [2022/18] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE RACCORDEMENT DE HARNAIS ARTICULÉ AVEC ÉLÉMENT DE FIXATION INTÉGRÉ | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 15.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2108716 (CHRISTIAN KUHLEMANN STIG OVE) [Y] 11-20, 31-33 * , entire document, especially fig. 1; pg 1, col. 1, In 1-6; pg 1, col. 2, In 1-3; pg 2, col. 1, In 51-55 *; | [A]FR2945221 (COURANT [FR]) [A] 1-23, 31-33* , entire document *; | [A]WO2012063064 (LATCHWAYS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-23, 31-33 * , entire document *; | [XY]US9560898 (HORTNAGL ANDREAS [AT]) [X] 1-10, 21-23 * , entire document, especially fig. 1-6; col. 1, In 11-18; col. 5, In 27-35, In 47-61; col. 6, In 1-4, In 21-34; col. 7, In 2-9, In 28-35; col. 8, In 8-38 * [Y] 11-20, 31-33; | [A]US2017120087 (COWELL CHRISTOPHER SIDNEY [GB], et al) [A] 1-23, 31-33 * , entire document *; | [A]US2017291046 (BOUQUIER BENOÎT [FR]) [A] 1-23, 31-33 * , entire document *; | [A]US2019070443 (HETRICH MITCHELL H [US], et al) [A] 1-23, 31-33 * , entire document * |