EP3986592 - INTEGRAGED, POINT OF CARE, BLOOD TESTING SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Werthman, Philip, E. 2080 Century Park East, Suite 907 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20832612.4 | 24.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020US39465 | Priority number, date | US201962865326P | 24.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962865326 P | [2022/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020264058 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3986592 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N33/49 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
B01L3/502753 (EP,IL,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
G01N1/34 (US);
G01N27/4145 (US);
G01N27/4146 (US);
G01N33/49 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/027 (EP,IL);
B01L2200/04 (US);
B01L2300/023 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/027 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/0636 (EP,IL,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/0803 (EP,IL);
B01L2300/0819 (US);
B01L2300/0896 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | B01D21/00, B01L9/00, G01N1/40, G01N33/49, G01N33/80 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE BLUTTESTSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN AM ORT DER BEHANDLUNG | [2022/17] | English: | INTEGRAGED, POINT OF CARE, BLOOD TESTING SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2022/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ANALYSE DE SANG AVEC POINT D'INTERVENTION INTÉGRÉ | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 05.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011104817 (KANG TAE GOO [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14; | [XY]US2015204860 (CHUI CHI ON [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,15 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14; | [A]US2018113093 (MOHANTY PRITIRAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]KR101899733B (GUMI ELECTRONICS & INFORMATION TECH RESEARCH INSTITUTE [KR]) [X] 1,3-5,7-12,15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008135502 (PYO HYEON-BONG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-24, 30 * , Fig. 1; para [0016], [0044], [0050], [0054], [0063]-[0065], [0071], [0072], [0075]-[0078], [0081], [0082] *; | [Y]US2008200343 (CLEMENS CHARLES E [US], et al) [Y] 17-24 * , Figs. 2, 10; para [0102], [0112], [0130], [0132], [0138], [0140], [0169], [0170], [0178], [0180], [0195], [0201], [0202], [0209], [0220], [0223], [0227], [0231], [0243] *; | [Y]US2012178178 (CHOI YOUN SUK [KR], et al) [Y] 1-24, 30 * , Figs. 1-2, 6; para [0042]-[0046], [0051] *; | [A]US2012220047 (SEIFRIED LYNN [US], et al) [A] 1-24, 30 * , para [0006]-[0097] *; | [AP]WO2020008469 (INDIAN INST TECH MADRAS [IN]) [AP] 1-24, 30* , pg 3, In 25 to pg 7, In 10 * |