EP3992313 - ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | ||
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states POSCO Holdings Inc. 440, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06194 / KR | ||
Former [2022/18] | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hyun Jong Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Heon-Jo Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20833002.7 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020KR08385 | Priority number, date | KR20190076503 | 26.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190076503 | [2022/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020263026 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3992313 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/12, C21D6/00, C21D9/46, C22C38/02, B21B45/06, B24C1/08, C21D7/06, C23C4/10, C23C4/134, C23C8/02, C23C8/10, C23C8/26, C23C8/80, C23C24/04 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/1216 (KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
B24C1/086 (EP);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D7/06 (EP);
C21D8/1222 (US);
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
C21D8/1244 (EP);
C21D8/1255 (EP);
C21D8/1261 (US);
C21D8/1272 (EP,US);
C21D8/1277 (EP);
C21D8/1283 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (US);
C22C38/06 (US);
C23C24/04 (EP);
C23C4/10 (EP);
C23C4/134 (EP);
C23C8/02 (EP);
C23C8/10 (EP);
C23C8/26 (EP);
C23C8/80 (EP);
H01F1/147 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | C21D8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | ORIENTIERTES ELEKTRISCHES STAHLBLECH UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/18] | English: | ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/18] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER ÉLECTRIQUE À GRAINS ORIENTÉS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2022 | Translation filed | 25.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 26.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5941480 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IA]US4897131 (WADA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * claim 1, col. 2 l. 31 - col. 3 l. 3, col. 4 l. 54- col. 5 l. 3, Examples 1-13, Fig. 1A, §38 * [A] 6-15; | [XAI]EP0528419 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 6,11-14 * claim 1, pg. 6 l. 14-19, pg. 6 l. 25-29, pg. 4 l. 35 - pg. 5 l. 1, Example 5, Table 5 * [A] 1-5 [I] 7-10,15; | [A]JPH0949028 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [A] 1-15 * §52 *; | [A]US5840131 (YAKASHIRO KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US7727644 (WATANABE MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * col. 19 l. 43-49 *; | [A]CN109628717 (SHOUGANG ZHIXIN QIANAN ELECTROMAGNETIC MAT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IPA]WO2020111740 (POSCO [KR]) [IP] 6-9,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,10; | [E]EP3889286 (POSCO [KR]) [E] 6-9,11-15* Claim 5, §46, §55, §58, §61, §62 * | International search | [Y]KR920009999 [Y] 9 * See abstract and claims 1-5. *; | [Y]JPH08143975 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [Y] 1-9,18-20 * See abstract and claims 1-2. *; | [A]KR20140060718 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0059]-[0063] and claims 1-5. *; | [A]KR101751526B (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0080]-[0090] and claims 1-10. *; | [AY]JP2018066036 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 10-17 * See paragraphs [0013] and [0030]-[0039], claims 2 and 4 and figure 1. * [Y] 1-9,18-20 |