EP3992698 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POLARIZING LENS, POLARIZING FILM, AND POLARIZING LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoya Lens Thailand Ltd. 853 Phaholyothin Road Prachatipat Thanyaburi Pathumthani 12130 / TH | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Keisuke c/o HOYA CORPORATION, 6-10-1, Nishi-Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8347 / JP | 02 /
MATSUE, Aoi c/o HOYA CORPORATION, 6-10-1, Nishi-Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8347 / JP | 03 /
YAMASHITA, Teruo c/o HOYA CORPORATION, 6-10-1, Nishi-Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8347 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Tsuyoshi c/o HOYA CORPORATION, 6-10-1, Nishi-Shinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8347 / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20833080.3 | 23.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24652 | Priority number, date | JP20190122173 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019122173 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262399 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992698 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/12, B29C39/10, G02B5/30, B29L11/00 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B29D11/00644 (EP,US);
B29D11/00442 (US);
B29C39/10 (EP);
B29D11/00009 (EP);
B29D11/00432 (EP);
B29D11/0048 (US);
G02B1/08 (EP,US);
G02B5/3033 (EP,US);
G02C7/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLARISIERENDEN LINSE, POLARISIERENDER FILM UND POLARISIERENDE LINSE | [2022/18] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POLARIZING LENS, POLARIZING FILM, AND POLARIZING LENS | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LENTILLE POLARISANTE, FILM POLARISANT ET LENTILLE POLARISANTE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2021 | Translation filed | 24.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003043257 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [XY]EP2503365 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [XY]JP2014142440 (HOYA LENSE MFG PHILIPPINE INC); | [A]EP2921900 (EHS LENS PHILIPPINES INC [PH]); | [A]JP2017007219 (HOPUNIKKU KENKYUSHO:KK, et al) | International search | [Y]JP2003128945 (YAMAHA CORP); | [XY]WO2014021466 (HOYA LENS MFG PHILIPPINES INC [PH], et al); | [XY]WO2014077339 (HOYA LENS MFG PHILIPPINES INC [PH], et al); | [XY]WO2014077338 (HOYA LENS MFG PHILIPPINES INC [PH], et al); | [Y]JP2017007219 (HOPUNIKKU KENKYUSHO:KK, et al); | [A]US2019064549 (BROWN STEPHEN [AU], et al) | by applicant | JP2001311804 | JP2001330806 |