EP3992573 - INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKI, Kota Osaka / JP | 02 /
JEON, Sohui Osaka / JP | 03 /
NISHIONO, Hiroaki Osaka / JP | 04 /
YOSHIHARA, Satoshi Osaka / JP | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20833179.3 | 23.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020JP24629 | Priority number, date | JP20190121346 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121346 | [2022/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262385 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992573 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/30, G06F3/0362, G05G1/08, G06F3/039, H01H19/00, H01H19/14 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/0362 (EP,CN,US);
G01B7/30 (US);
G01D5/24 (US);
G01R25/00 (CN);
G06F3/0393 (EP);
G06F3/0448 (US);
G05G1/08 (EP);
G05G5/065 (EP);
G06F2203/04107 (US);
H01H19/11 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G01B7/30, G06F3/0362 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | EINGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | INPUT DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2021 | Translation filed | 15.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5691646 (SASAKI KOUJI [JP]); | [I]US2019025092 (UEDA TAKU [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH09185459 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB); | [A]JP2000314607 (MITUTOYO CORP); | [A]WO2008132930 (HOSIDEN CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2017009375 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2018084455 (CANON KK) | by applicant | WO2016075907 |