EP3992190 - COMPOUND FOR ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUI, Jinhyun 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Dong Min 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 03 /
RYU, Dong Wan 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Ho Kuk 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Sangshin 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Jaehoon 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Changwoo 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 08 /
SHIN, Chang Ju 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 09 /
LEE, Namheon 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | 10 /
JUNG, Sung-Hyun 130 Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16678 / KR | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20833191.8 | 26.06.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020KR08390 | Priority number, date | KR20190078081 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190078081 | KR20200078023 | 25.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200078023 | [2022/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020263029 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992190 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, C07D409/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07F7/08, H10K50/11, H10K85/60, H10K101/10 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,CN,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN);
C07D409/04 (EP,CN);
C07D409/14 (EP,CN);
C07D487/04 (US);
C07F7/0807 (CN);
C07F7/0816 (EP);
C09K11/06 (US);
H10K50/11 (EP,CN,US);
H10K85/40 (CN);
H10K85/615 (CN,US);
H10K85/653 (CN);
H10K85/654 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (CN,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP,CN);
C09K2211/1018 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | C07D405/04, C07D409/04, C07D405/14, C07D409/14, C07F7/08, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG FÜR ORGANISCHE OPTOELEKTRONISCHE DIODE, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ORGANISCHE OPTOELEKTRONISCHE DIODE, ORGANISCHE OPTOELEKTRONISCHE DIODE UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | COMPOUND FOR ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, ORGANIC OPTOELECTRONIC DIODE, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2022/18] | French: | COMPOSÉ POUR DIODE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE, COMPOSITION POUR DIODE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE, DIODE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2022 | Translation filed | 26.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 04.01.2023 | Observations by third parties | 04.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016079546 (PARK JUNHA [KR], et al); | [X]KR20160041822 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]KR101847347B (DOOSAN CORP [KR]); | [X]KR20190002206 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]CN109265450 (SHANGHAI TAOE CHEMICAL TECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2019027212 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20190038246 (DUK SAN NEOLUX CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2019198780 (KIM BYUNGKU [KR], et al); | [XP]EP3670510 (DUK SAN NEOLUX CO LTD [KR]); | [E]EP3904353 (LT MAT CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [X]KR101847347B (DOOSAN CORP [KR]); | [X]KR20190002206 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20190038246 (DUK SAN NEOLUX CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20190043898 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [X]US2019198780 (KIM BYUNGKU [KR], et al) | by applicant | US5061569 | JPH059471 | WO9509147 | JPH07126615 | JPH1095973 | KR20180129656 | KR101970000B | other | KR101814875B | CN109265450 | KR20190013353 | EP3670510 | EP3904353 |