EP3968394 - HEAT-UTILIZING POWER GENERATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd. 3-6-6, Shibuya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | For all designated states Tokyo Institute of Technology 2-12-1, Ookayama Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEI, Biao c/o Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd., 758, Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Naoya c/o Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd., 758, Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 03 /
TAKEUCHI, Masaki c/o Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd., 758, Konosu Koga-shi, Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 04 /
MATSUSHITA, Sachiko c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, 2-12-1, Ookayama, Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20833258.5 | 17.06.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020JP23825 | Priority number, date | JP20190119044 | 26.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019119044 | [2022/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020262171 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968394 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10N15/00, H02N11/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
H10N15/00 (EP);
H10N10/17 (CN,US);
H10N10/80 (CN);
H10N19/101 (CN);
Y02E20/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | H01L37/00, H02N11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | WÄRMENUTZENDES ENERGIEERZEUGUNGSMODUL | [2022/11] | English: | HEAT-UTILIZING POWER GENERATION MODULE | [2022/11] | French: | MODULE DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE UTILISANT LA CHALEUR | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | Translation filed | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 15.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010258155 (LEE SUNG HO [KR], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2010251692 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH); | [Y]WO2012140856 (UNIV TSUKUBA [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2017038988 (TOKYO INST TECH [JP]); | [Y]JP2017152632 (EKBO KK); | [Y]JP2018019042 (GCE INST CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2017038988 |