EP3966540 - DRIVE SHAFT MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kongsberg Maritime AS Strandpromenaden 50 3183 Horten / NO | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSSEN, Stefan Blom Kystadbrinken 19 7027 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
FAGERLI, Morten Presthusvegen 18D 7056 Ranheim / NO | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Curo AS Vestre Rosten 81 7075 Tiller / NO | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20833296.5 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020NO50179 | Priority number, date | NO20190000818 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: NO 20190818 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020263104 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966540 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.12.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/166, B63H1/12, B63H1/14, F02K99/00, G01L3/00, G01L5/12, G01L5/13 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G01L3/08 (EP,KR,US);
G01L3/10 (KR,NO);
G01L3/24 (EP,KR,NO);
G01H1/00 (NO);
G01H1/006 (EP,KR);
G01H7/00 (NO);
G01H9/00 (EP,KR);
G01L27/002 (US);
G01L3/12 (KR,NO);
G01L5/12 (KR);
G01L5/13 (KR);
G01L5/166 (KR);
G01M15/05 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSWELLENÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/11] | English: | DRIVE SHAFT MONITORING SYSTEM | [2022/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE D'ARBRE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 07.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5253531 (WALKER DANA A [US], et al); | [XI]US5918286 (SMITH FRANTZ KARSTEN [NO], et al); | [XI]US2005044968 (SOUTHWARD STEVE C [US]) | International search | [DA]WO9610167 (SMITH FRANTZ KARSTEN [NO]); | [DA]EP0635120 (WALKER DANA A [US], et al); | [A]CN102901596 (UNIV NORTH CHINA); | [A]CN103900747 (UNIV WUHAN TECH); | [A]US2015107342 (JENSEN RAYMOND VERLE [US], et al); | [DA]EP3343192 (AROS ELECTRONICS AB [SE]); | [A]CN109506816 (BEIJING HIRAIN TECH CO LTD); |