EP4078332 - CLOCK SELECTOR CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAJDA, Bartosz c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Frode c/o Nordic Semiconductor ASA Otto Nielsens veg 12 7052 Trondheim / NO | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20833791.5 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020EP86522 | Priority number, date | GB20190018998 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: GB 201918998 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021122816 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4078332 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/08 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06F1/08 (EP,US);
H03K5/135 (US);
H03K3/037 (US);
H03K5/26 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | TAKTAUSWAHLSCHALTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | CLOCK SELECTOR CIRCUIT | [2022/43] | French: | CIRCUIT SÉLECTEUR D'HORLOGE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 20.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US5381542 (CARLSON ROBERT H [US]) [X] 1,3,9,10,12,13,15 * column 2, line 25 - column 6, line 3; figures 2-4 * [A] 6,7,11 [Y] 8 [I] 2,4,5,14; | [XAYI]US6806755 (SIMMONDS ALAN CHRISTOPHER [US]) [X] 1,3,9-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 6,7 [Y] 8 [I] 2,4,5,14; | [A]US2015227162 (ZHU DAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2017177020 (MUKHERJI ARUP [US], et al) [Y] 8 * the whole document * |