EP4085505 - RECHARGEABLE CHARGER FOR RECHARGEABLE DEVICES, AND METHOD FOR CHARGING RECHARGEABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonova Consumer Hearing GmbH Am Labor 1 30900 Wedemark / DE | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONGBIN, Xu 1229, Block 19A Woodlands Avenue 6 SINGAPORE 739000 / SG | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20833804.6 | 17.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020EP86620 | Priority number, date | US202016732521 | 02.01.2020 Original published format: US202016732521 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021136671 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085505 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4085505 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H02J7/34 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H02J7/00711 (EP,KR);
H02J7/0071 (US);
H02J7/00032 (KR,US);
H02J7/0044 (KR,US);
H02J7/0048 (KR,US);
H02J7/342 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARES LADEGERÄT FÜR WIEDERAUFLADBARE GERÄTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN VON WIEDERAUFLADBAREN GERÄTEN | [2022/45] | English: | RECHARGEABLE CHARGER FOR RECHARGEABLE DEVICES, AND METHOD FOR CHARGING RECHARGEABLE DEVICES | [2022/45] | French: | CHARGEUR RECHARGEABLE POUR DISPOSITIFS RECHARGEABLES, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE DE DISPOSITIFS RECHARGEABLES | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 14.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.08.2024
30.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/41] | 10.09.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | LU | 17.12.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
IT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5497067 (SHAW DONALD E [US]); | [A]US2017288420 (JOHNSON GEORGE F [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017205575 (ZPOWER LLC [US]) | by applicant | US9502913 | Opposition | US5497067 | WO2017205575 | US2019288537 |