EP4230768 - FLOATING FLOW-GUIDE PLATE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fusion Fuel Portugal, S.A. Rua da Fábrica, S/N, Sabugo 2715-376 Almargem do Bispo / PT | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferreira Silva, Jaime Domingos 1495-161 Lisboa / PT | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Carvalho Franco, Isabel J.E. Dias Costa Lda. Rua do Salitre 195 1269-063 Lisboa / PT | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 20833935.8 | 28.10.2020 | [2023/34] | WO2020IB60096 | Priority number, date | PT20200116826 | 14.10.2020 Original published format: PT 2020116826 | [2023/34] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022079485 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | PT | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230768 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/04, C25B9/15, C25B9/19, C25B9/60, C25B11/036 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
C25B9/15 (EP,IL,PT,US);
C25B1/04 (EP,IL,PT);
C25B11/036 (EP,IL,PT);
C25B9/19 (EP,IL,PT);
C25B9/60 (EP,IL,PT,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Validation states | TN | 21.06.2023 | Title | German: | SCHWIMMENDE STRÖMUNGSFÜHRUNGSPLATTE FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLEN | [2023/34] | English: | FLOATING FLOW-GUIDE PLATE FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS | [2023/34] | French: | PLAQUE FLOTTANTE DE GUIDAGE DE FLUX POUR CELLULES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2023 | Translation filed | 12.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/34] | 12.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 12.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2023/34] | 06.07.2023 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 14.07.2023 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 21.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014151217 (NAKAZAWA KOJI [JP]); | [A]CN105951118 (C HYSA TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2020173037 (ABOUATALLAH RAMI MICHEL [CA], et al) |