EP3994005 - BIODEGRADABLE VCI PACKAGING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northern Technologies International Corporation 4201 Woodland Road Circle Pines, MN 55014 / US | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Northern Technologies International Corporation 23900 Mercantile Road Beachwood, OH 44122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAHLARI, Mahin 13 Scotch Pine Ct. North Oaks, Minnesota 55127 / US | 02 /
NG, Ik-Hau 22 Village Parkway Circle Pines, Minnesota 55014 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20834605.6 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US40277 | Priority number, date | US201962870208P | 03.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962870208 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021003146 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994005 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/36, B65D81/26, C23F11/02, C23F15/00, C08K3/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP);
C08L67/04 (KR);
C08G63/183 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
C08K3/01 (EP);
C08K3/013 (EP,KR);
C08K3/28 (EP);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08K5/0008 (EP);
C08L67/02 (EP,KR,US);
C23F11/02 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2264/104 (EP);
B32B2307/7163 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/752 (EP);
B32B2439/46 (EP);
C08K2201/014 (EP);
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08K5/098 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/013, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08K3/01, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08K3/28, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K5/0008, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08K3/013, C08K3/28, C08L67/04 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08L67/04, C08K3/013, C08K5/09, C08K5/098, C08K5/3475 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE VCI-VERPACKUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2022/19] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE VCI PACKAGING COMPOSITIONS | [2022/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'EMBALLAGE VCI BIODÉGRADABLES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR100934197B ; | [X]US6617415 (MIKSIC BORIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * column 4; table . * * example VII *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 25, Database accession no. 2010-B04675, XP002809638 & KR100934197B B1 20091229 (RUST CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6,8-13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050]; example . * * claims 1,3,4,9 * | International search | [X]US2004173779 (GENCER MEHMET A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * ; para [0002], [0007], [0020], [0023]-[0024], [0026], [0039], [0043]-[0045], [0047], [0050], [0054], [0057]-[0059] *; | [A]US2007145334 (NUMBU NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; see entire document *; | [A]US2008064812 (NARAYAN RAMANI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; see entire document *; | [A]US2013231420 (ALIDEDEOGLU HUSNU [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; see entire document *; | [A]US2016230333 (HICKIE BRIAN ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-20 * ; see entire document *; | [AP]WO2020032931 (NORTHERN TECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION [US]) [AP] 1-20* ; see entire document * |