EP3994951 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR ENHANCED DIRECT LINK COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 2050 W 190th Street Suite 450 Torrance, CA 90504 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHITRAKAR, Rojan c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1, 02-11, Singapore 469332 / SG | 02 /
HUANG, Lei c/o Panasonic R&D Center Singapore 202 Bedok South Avenue 1, 02-11, Singapore 469332 / SG | 03 /
URABE, Yoshio Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20835174.2 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020SG50249 | Priority number, date | SG20191006255Q | 04.07.2019 Original published format: SG10201906255Q | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021002802 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994951 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W74/00, // H04W84/12 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP,KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0278 (US);
H04W74/002 (EP);
H04W74/0808 (KR);
H04W76/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04W76/14, H04W74/08, H04W72/00, H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN DIREKTVERBINDUNGSKOMMUNIKATION | [2022/19] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR ENHANCED DIRECT LINK COMMUNICATION | [2022/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION POUR UNE COMMUNICATION DE LIAISON DIRECTE AMÉLIORÉE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 17.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2012120892 (FREDA MARTINO M [CA], et al); | [I]US2013121293 (SURINENI SHRAVAN K [US], et al); | [YA]US2014211703 (SEOK YONG HO [KR]); | [A]US2018020372 (VIGER PASCAL [FR], et al) | International search | [X]US2012120892 (FREDA MARTINO M [CA], et al); | [A]US2012314658 (KIM EUNSUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2013064152 (SEOK YONG HO [KR]); | [X]US2013121293 (SURINENI SHRAVAN K [US], et al); | [X]US2013329693 (LEE JIHYUN [KR], et al); | [X]US2014211703 (SEOK YONG HO [KR]); | [X]US2014328262 (SAMPATH HEMANTH [US], et al); | [X]US2015036640 (SEOK YONG HO [KR]); | [A]WO2018236422 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) | by applicant | US2012120892 | US2013121293 | US2014211703 | US2018020372 |