EP3989673 - DATA TRANSMISSION LINK ESTABLISHMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Xingyue ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Xueyan ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Shuang ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South, Hi-tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Despag-Straße 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20835443.1 | 29.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020CN98786 | Priority number, date | CN201910595342 | 03.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910595342 | [2022/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021000827 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989673 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/10, H04L12/46, H04W28/02, H04W28/10, H04W76/16, H04W88/16, H04W76/11, H04W76/12 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/0268 (EP);
H04W76/11 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/16 (EP);
H04W80/10 (US);
H04W88/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H04W76/10, H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERBINDUNG SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/17] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION LINK ESTABLISHMENT METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE LIAISON DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2021 | Translation filed | 21.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN108965159 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2018233484 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [PX]CN110536481 (ZTE CORP); |