EP3998723 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS, AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spreadtrum Communications (Shanghai) Co., Ltd. Spreadtrum Center, Building No.1 Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Guochu Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1, Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Pudongxinqu Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
YU, Zhongxing Spreadtrum Center Building No. 1, Lane 2288 Zuchongzhi Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Pudongxinqu Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 17067 200 10 Malmö / SE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20836162.6 | 19.06.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020CN97045 | Priority number, date | CN201910608818 | 08.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910608818 | [2022/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021004253 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998723 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04W4/70, H04L1/18 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN,KR);
H04W28/04 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1854 (US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L1/1893 (CN,KR);
H04L1/22 (US);
H04W24/04 (US);
H04W28/0273 (US);
H04W4/70 (CN,KR);
H04L2001/0097 (EP);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W84/20 (US);
H04W88/04 (US);
H04W92/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | H04L1/16, H04W4/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, -EINRICHTUNG UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/19] | English: | DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD, APPARATUS, AND DEVICE | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | Translation filed | 07.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN109905925 (BESTECHNIC TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD); | US2020359134 [ ] (TONG WEIFENG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2017221072 (ATHULURUTLRUMALA GIRISRINIVASARAO [US], et al); | [A]CN108111194 (NANJING ZHONGGAN MICROELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]CN108323246 (SHENZHEN WEITONGBO TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108337074 (BESTECHNIC SHANGHAI CO LTD); | [A]CN109547992 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SHANGHAI INC); | [X]CN109561419 (BESTECHNIC TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD); | [X]CN109905925 (BESTECHNIC TECH SHANGHAI CO LTD); | [PX]CN110266444 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SHANGHAI INC) |