EP3994357 - DIVERSIFIED AND REMOVABLE PUMP SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INFLATING AND DEFLATING INFLATABLE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intex Industries Xiamen Co. Ltd Xinyang Industrial Zone No 858 Wengjiao Road Haicang Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Zhi Xiong No. 858 Wengjiao Road, Xinyang Industrial Zone, Haicang Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Huai Tian No. 858 Wengjiao Road, Xinyang Industrial Zone, Haicang Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Zhi Wen No. 858 Wengjiao Road, Xinyang Industrial Zone, Haicang Xiamen, Fujian 361022 / CN | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Vleck, Jan Montagu Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20836715.1 | 06.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020IB56351 | Priority number, date | CN20192140823U | 05.07.2019 Original published format: CN 201921040823 U | CN20192141113U | 05.07.2019 Original published format: CN 201921041113 U | CN20192141114U | 05.07.2019 Original published format: CN 201921041114 U | CN202020213452U | 26.02.2020 Original published format: CN 202020213452 U | CN202020352250U | 19.03.2020 Original published format: CN 202020352250 U | CN202020478355U | 03.04.2020 Original published format: CN 202020478355 U | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021005495 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3994357 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04, F04B39/12, F04B39/14, F04D25/08, F04D29/50 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
F04B39/14 (EP);
F04D27/00 (US);
F04B35/04 (EP);
F04B39/121 (EP);
F04B39/123 (EP);
F04D25/084 (EP);
F04D29/503 (EP);
F04D25/06 (US);
F04D29/325 (US);
F04D29/522 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | F04D25/08, F04D29/60, F04B35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | DIVERSIFIZIERTE UND ABNEHMBARE PUMPSYSTEME SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBLASEN UND ENTLEEREN VON AUFBLASBAREN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2022/19] | English: | DIVERSIFIED AND REMOVABLE PUMP SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INFLATING AND DEFLATING INFLATABLE OBJECTS | [2022/19] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE POMPE DIVERSIFIÉS ET AMOVIBLES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GONFLER ET DÉGONFLER DES OBJETS GONFLABLES | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN105952663 (INTEX IND (XIAMEN) CO LTD); | [XI]CN208010629U (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD); | [XI]WO2019102443 (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [X]CN1391866 (DUOYI CO LTD TAIWAN [CN]); | [X]US6679686 (WANG CHENG-CHUNG [TW]); | [X]US6733254 (YEN STANLEY [TW]); | [A]CN2716554Y (NORTHPOLE CHINA LTD [CN]); | [A]CN103004731 (UNIV NORTHWEST A&F); | [A]CN205779836U (INTEX IND (XIAMEN) CO LTD); | [A]CN208010629U (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD); | [A]CN109480533 (SHANGHAI JILONG PLASTIC PRODUCTS CO LTD); | [PX]CN209115351U (BESTWAY INFLATABLES & MAT CORP); | [PX]CN210397186U (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD); | [PX]CN210423098U (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD); | [PX]CN210531184U (INTEX IND XIAMEN CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2019102443 |