EP3989316 - CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Battery Solution 1017 Fusion Tech Center 222 Wangsimni-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04763 / KR | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Yang-Kook 111-801 150, Samseong-ro, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06288 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Hoon-Hee 304-804, 72, Singeum 1-gil Gongju-si, Chungcheongnam-do 32578 / KR | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20836763.1 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020KR08500 | Priority number, date | KR20190083105 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190083105 | KR20200008851 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200008851 | [2022/17] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006520 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989316 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M4/36, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, C01G53/00, C01G53/04 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
C01G53/00 (EP);
C01G53/006 (EP);
C01G53/04 (EP);
C01G53/42 (EP);
C01G53/50 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (US);
H01M4/62 (EP);
C01P2002/52 (EP);
C01P2002/60 (EP);
C01P2002/74 (EP);
C01P2004/20 (EP);
C01P2004/50 (EP);
C01P2004/54 (EP);
C01P2004/84 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | H01M4/525, H01M4/36, H01M4/62, H01M10/052 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | KATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, SEIN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, DIE ES BEINHALTET | [2022/17] | English: | CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, AND LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY COMPRISING SAME | [2022/17] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM LE COMPRENANT | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | Translation filed | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3272710 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0199] , [0204] , [0211] , [0221]; figures 1c,3b-3d,15a,15b,17d-17f; examples prep 1,ex1,8,12,13; claim 1 * [I] 8; | [X]CN109713297 (NINGBO RONGBAI NEW ENERGY TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,4-7,9-15* figure 1; examples 1,2; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]KR20170063395 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 7-11,13,14,16,17 * See claims 1, 3 and 4. *; | [A]KR20180077018 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-21* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190008156 (IUCF HYU [KR]) [A] 1-21 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20190044327 (ULSAN NAT INST SCIENCE & TECH UNIST [KR]) [A] 1-21 * See entire document. *; | [YX]KR20190065963 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 7-11,13,14,16,17 * See paragraphs [0019], [0021]-[0023], [0028]-[0030], [0034], [0045]-[0049] and [0087]; claim 14; and figures 1 and 3. * [X] 1-6,12,15,18-21 | by applicant | KR20140119621 |