EP3997127 - DLL3-TARGETING ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | For all designated states TRI-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute 413 East 69th Street Box 300 New York, NY 10021 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POIRIER, John, T. c/o Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 02 /
RUDIN, Charles c/o Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 03 /
LEWIS, Jason c/o Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | 04 /
KHAN, Abdul c/o Tri-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute 413 East 69th Street, Box 300 New York, NY 10021 / US | 05 /
ANDREW, David c/o Tri-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute 413 East 69th Street, Box 300 New York, NY 10021 / US | 06 /
CHEN, Xinlei c/o Tri-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute 413 East 69th Street, Box 300 New York, NY 10021 / US | 07 /
LORENZ, Ivo c/o Tri-Institutional Therapeutics Discovery Institute 413 East 69th Street, Box 300 New York, NY 10021 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20836805.0 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41282 | Priority number, date | US201962872915P | 11.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962872915 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007371 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997127 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/63 (US);
G01N33/68 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/21 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | GEGEN DLL3 GERICHTETE ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2022/19] | English: | DLL3-TARGETING ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2022/19] | French: | ANTICORPS CIBLANT LA DLL3 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2013126746 (STEM CENTRX INC [US]); | [I]WO2015127407 (STEMCENTRX INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2005031614 (ROSKOS LORIN [US], et al); | [XA]US7718774 (MATHER JENNIE P [US], et al); | [X]US2013195878 (MACDONALD LYNN [US], et al); | [A]US2016208019 (BACAC MARINA [CH], et al) |