EP3993764 - METHOD FOR PREVENTING HAIR LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENDL, Michael One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | 02 /
HEITMAN, Nicholas, J. One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | 03 /
SENNETT, Rachel One Gustave L. Levy Place New York, NY 10029 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Atkins, James Gordon John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20837538.6 | 02.07.2020 | [2022/19] | WO2020US40715 | Priority number, date | US201962871030P | 05.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962871030 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007108 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993764 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K31/551, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61Q7/00, A61P17/14 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/277 (US);
A61K31/343 (US);
A61K31/366 (US);
A61K31/496 (US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K31/553 (US);
A61K31/5575 (US);
A61K31/567 (US);
A61K31/573 (US);
A61K31/58 (US);
A61K31/585 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K8/49 (EP);
A61K8/4926 (EP);
A61K8/494 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K8/49, A61Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON HAARAUSFALL | [2022/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PREVENTING HAIR LOSS | [2022/19] | French: | MÉTHODE DE PRÉVENTION CONTRE LA PERTE DE CHEVEUX | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/19] | 26.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 16.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02273610 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,5,7,8,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] *; | [X]US2009082427 (DE LA TORRE FREDERIC [FR], et al) [X] 8-10,13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0017] , [0018]; example -; claim - *; | [X]CN103070851 (PLA LANZHOU MILITARY DISTR URUMQI GENERAL HOSPITAL) [X] 1,5,7,8,13 * example 1; claims 1,9,10 *; | [X]KR20150085964 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) [X] 1,5-9,13 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017122666 (NAT UNIV CORP CHIBA UNIV [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]JP2019011278 (OKAJIMA KENJI, et al) [X] 1,4,7,8,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] *; | [X] - TONGYU CAO WIKRAMANAYAKE ET AL, "Prevention and treatment of alopecia areata with quercetin in the C3H/HeJ mouse model", CELL STRESS AND CHAPERONES ; A COMPREHENSIVE JOURNAL OF STRESS BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20111101), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S12192-011-0305-3, ISSN 1466-1268, pages 267 - 274, XP035013316 [X] 1,7,8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12192-011-0305-3 | [A] - XIONG YONGJIAN ET AL, "Myosin Light Chain Kinase: A Potential Target for Treatment of Inflammatory Diseases", FRONTIERS IN PHARMACOLOGY, (20170523), vol. 8, doi:10.3389/fphar.2017.00292, XP093065035 [A] 1-15 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fphar.2017.00292 | [X] - PAUS ET AL, "Therapeutic strategies for treating hair loss", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY: THERAPEUTIC STRATEGIES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060401), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.DDSTR.2006.03.004, ISSN 1740-6773, pages 101 - 110, XP005394597 [X] 1,7,8 * page 102, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ddstr.2006.03.004 | [A] - TAKAHASHI T ET AL, "SEVERAL SELECTIVE PROTEIN KINASE C INHIBITORS INCLUDING PROCYANIDINS PROMOTE THEIR GROWTH", SKIN PHARMACOLOGY AND SKIN APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (20000501), vol. 13, doi:10.1159/000029918, ISSN 1422-2868, pages 133 - 142, XP009001663 [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000029918 | [A] - ALKA MADAAN ET AL, "Review of Hair Follicle Dermal Papilla cells as in vitro screening model for hair growth", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COSMETIC SCIENCE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (20181004), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1111/ICS.12489, ISSN 0142-5463, pages 429 - 450, XP071470513 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/ics.12489 | [A] - MORGAN B. A., "The Dermal Papilla: An Instructive Niche for Epithelial Stem and Progenitor Cells in Development and Regeneration of the Hair Follicle", COLD SPRING HARBOR PERSPECTIVES IN MEDICINE, vol. 4, no. 7, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a015180, (20140701), pages a015180 - a015180, Internet, URL: http://perspectivesinmedicine.cshlp.org/content/4/7/a015180.full.pdf, (20230718), XP055863294 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a015180 | International search | [A]US2008081078 (DE LANEROLLE PRIMAL [US]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document esp abstract, para [0057] *; | [A]US2010098732 (TIPPENS DORR FELT [US]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [A]WO2010068692 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-10* , entire document *; | [A]WO2011039175 (MELNIK BODO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2012329780 (THORMANN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-9, 35, and (38-40, 41/40)/35 * , entire document esp abstract, claim 1, claim 18, para [0091] * [A] 10 |