EP3996703 - USE OF IMMUNE MODULATORS TO IMPROVE NERVE REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | For all designated states Keefer, Edward W. 4911 Alcott Street Dallas, TX 75206 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Jonathan c/o University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center 5323 Harry Hines Blvd. Dallas, TX 75390 / US | 02 /
VASUDEVAN, Srikanth c/o University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center 5323 Harry Hines Blvd. Dallas, TX 75390 / US | 03 /
KEEFER, Edward 4911 Alcott Street Dallas, TX 75206 / US | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Rückerl, Florian Dehmel & Bettenhausen Patentanwälte PartmbB Herzogspitalstraße 11 80331 München / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20837543.6 | 07.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US40960 | Priority number, date | US201962871552P | 08.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962871552 P | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007192 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3996703 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61L27/18, A61K38/18, A61K31/36, A61K31/519, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61K31/195, A61K31/395 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
A61K38/185 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP);
A61K31/395 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K38/18 (US);
A61K38/1866 (EP,US);
A61K38/204 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61L2300/114 (EP);
A61L2300/414 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/36, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/395, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/1866, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/11] | A61K31/36, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, A61K31/195, A61K31/395 | ||
Former IPC [2022/19] | A61K31/36, A61K38/17, A61K45/06, A61P25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON IMMUNMODULATOREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER NERVENREGENERATION | [2022/19] | English: | USE OF IMMUNE MODULATORS TO IMPROVE NERVE REGENERATION | [2022/19] | French: | UTILISATION DE MODULATEURS IMMUNITAIRES POUR AMÉLIORER LA RÉGÉNÉRATION NERVEUSE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6268352 (SONG HONG-JUN [US], et al); | [XY]US2010112038 (SCHAEBITZ WOLF-RUEDIGER [DE], et al); | [XY]US2011124706 (HE ZHIGANG [US], et al); | [XY]US2015224345 (WARLICK JOHN [US]); | [XY]WO2016023130 (NAT HEALTH RESEARCH INSTITUTES, et al); | [XI]US2016206592 (SOLOMON BEKA [IL], et al); | [XY]US2017112871 (NELSON HOWARD [US], et al); | [XI]US2018200232 (SUN ZHAOLI [US]); | [XI]US2018296551 (SOLOMON BEKA [IL], et al); | International search | [XY]WO2008156644 (FRANK DAVID A [US]); | [XY]WO2014137229 (CURONZ HOLDINGS COMPANY LTD [NZ]); |