EP3998406 - VACUUM PUMP DEVICE AND LIFTING TYPE GATE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Japan Limited 1078-1 Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi, Chiba 276-8523 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENOMOTO, Yoshihiro c/o Edwards Japan Limited, 1078-1, Yoshihashi Yachiyo-shi Chiba 276-8523 / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/19] | Totman, Clare Elizabeth Edwards Limited Innovation Drive Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 9TW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20837814.1 | 03.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020JP26286 | Priority number, date | JP20190129673 | 11.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019129673 | [2022/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021006224 | Date: | 14.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998406 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F04D19/04, F04D29/52 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F04D19/042 (EP,KR);
F16K1/00 (CN);
F04D19/04 (US);
F04D29/524 (EP);
F04D29/644 (KR);
F16K1/38 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | F04D19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | VAKUUMPUMPVORRICHTUNG UND SCHIEBERVENTIL VOM HUBTYP | [2022/19] | English: | VACUUM PUMP DEVICE AND LIFTING TYPE GATE VALVE | [2022/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POMPE À VIDE ET ROBINET-VANNE À SOULÈVEMENT | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | Translation filed | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1193889 (EBARA CORP) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021]; figures 4-7 * * abstract * [Y] 3; | [X]US6062810 (MIYAMOTO MATSUTARO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-6 * * abstract *; | [X]US6217278 (SHIOKAWA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 46; figures 1-4 ** abstract *; | [X]JP2001304173 (EBARA CORP) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [XY]JP2003071271 (FOI KK) [X] 1,5-9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1,3,4 * * abstract * [Y] 3 | International search | [XYA]JPH1193889 (EBARA CORP) [X] 1-2, 4, 8 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0021], fig. 4-7 * [Y] 3 [A] 5-7, 9; | [XYA]JP2001304173 (EBARA CORP) [X] 1-2, 4, 8 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0022], fig. 1 * [Y] 3 [A] 5-7, 9; | [XYA]JP2003071271 (FOI KK) [X] 1, 5-9 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0032], fig. 1, 3, 4 * [Y] 3[A] 2, 4 | by applicant | JPH1162881 |