EP4088258 - TEMPORAL CODING OF MARKERS FOR OBJECT TRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXFORD METRICS PLC 6 Oxford Pioneer Park Yarnton Oxfordshire OX5 1QU / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states OXFORD METRICS PLC 6 Oxford Industrial Park Yarnton Oxon, OX5 1QU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRITCHETT, Phil c/o Metrics PLC Unit 6, Oxford Industrial Park Mead Road, Yarnton Kidlington, Oxford OX5 1QU / GB | 02 /
SMYTH, Paul c/o Metrics PLC Unit 6, Oxford Industrial Park Mead Road, Yarnton Kidlington, Oxford OX5 1QU / GB | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 20838202.8 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/46] | WO2020GB53273 | Priority number, date | GB20200000116 | 06.01.2020 Original published format: GB 202000116 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140315 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088258 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20, A61B5/11, G06T7/246, G06T7/292, G06T7/70 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G06T7/20 (EP,US);
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/1127 (EP);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06T7/292 (EP);
A61B5/112 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30196 (EP);
G06T2207/30204 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | ZEITLICHE CODIERUNG VON MARKIERUNGEN FÜR OBJEKTVERFOLGUNG | [2022/46] | English: | TEMPORAL CODING OF MARKERS FOR OBJECT TRACKING | [2022/46] | French: | CODAGE TEMPOREL DE MARQUEURS POUR SUIVI D'OBJET | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 11.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/32] | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2023/32] | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0951697 (QUALISYS AB [SE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0037] * [A] 3,4; | [XA]US2015283460 (HUANG YAZHOU [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,26 * abstract * * paragraph [0094] * [A] 3,4; | [Y]US2015346327 (BEALL ANDREW C [US], et al) [Y] 12-20,27 * abstract ** paragraphs [0009] , [0039] , [0041] *; | [XA]CN107767394 (JIANG BO, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3,4; | [XAYI]US10403050 (BEALL ANDREW C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11,21-26,28-33 * abstract * * column 6, line 11 - line 45 * [A] 3,4 [Y] 12-20,27 [I] 5-8,10 |