EP4081557 - HETEROPHASIC PROPYLENE COPOLYMER (HECO) COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT IMPACT STRENGTH, STIFFNESS AND PROCESSABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABU DHABI POLYMERS CO. LTD (BOROUGE) LLC. Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P.O. Box 6925 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIMKE, Katja Borouge Pte Ltd Abu Dhabi Branch Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P. O. Box 6951 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | 02 /
VAN CAUWENBERGHE, Hans Jozef Francois Borouge Pte Ltd Abu Dhabi Branch Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P. O. Box 6951 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20839058.3 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020EP87638 | Priority number, date | EP20190219323 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19219323 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130228 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081557 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F110/06, C08F210/06, C08L23/16 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
C08F210/06 (EP,KR);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR);
C08F110/06 (KR);
C08F210/16 (KR);
C08L23/12 (KR);
C08F2500/05 (KR);
C08F2500/12 (KR);
C08F2500/27 (KR);
C08F2500/30 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F2/001 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6465 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6492 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F4/6545 (EP);
C08L23/16, C08L23/12, C08L23/12, C08L23/16 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/12 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/05, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/27, C08F2500/31, C08F2500/30, C08F2500/35 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | HETEROPHASISCHE PROPYLEN-COPOLYMER(HECO)-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HERVORRAGENDER SCHLAGFESTIGKEIT, STEIFIGKEIT UND VERARBEITBARKEIT | [2022/44] | English: | HETEROPHASIC PROPYLENE COPOLYMER (HECO) COMPOSITION HAVING EXCELLENT IMPACT STRENGTH, STIFFNESS AND PROCESSABILITY | [2022/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMÈRE DE PROPYLÈNE HÉTÉROPHASIQUE (HECO) AYANT UNE RÉSISTANCE AUX CHOCS, UNE RIGIDITÉ ET UNE APTITUDE AU TRAITEMENT EXCELLENTES | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 12.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2275485 (BOREALIS AG [AT]); | [XI]WO2016066453 (BOREALIS AG [AT]); | [XI]WO2017085195 (BOREALIS AG [AT]); | [T]WO2017148969 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) | by applicant | WO8707620 | EP0491566 | WO9212182 | WO9219653 | WO9219658 | EP0586390 | EP0591224 | EP0887379 | WO9924478 | WO9924479 | WO0068315 | WO2004000899 | WO2004111095 |