EP4069377 - EMERGENCY EVACUATION SYSTEM, AN EMERGENCY EVACUATION UNIT AND OPERATION METHOD OF SUCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firebag S.r.l. Viale Bruno Buozzi 102 00197 Roma / IT | [2022/52] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states Progetech S.r.l. Via Bruno Buozzi 102 00197 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPASIANO, Matteo c/o PROGETECH S.R.L. VIALE BRUNO BUOZZI, 102 00197 ROMA / IT | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Tiburzi, Andrea, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20839153.2 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020IT50300 | Priority number, date | IT20190023268 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: IT201900023268 | [2022/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111487 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069377 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62B1/20 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A62B1/20 (EP,US);
G01G19/44 (US);
G01G19/52 (US);
G08B5/36 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | NOTEVAKUIERUNGSSYSTEM, NOTEVAKUIERUNGSEINHEIT UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR DIESES SYSTEM | [2022/41] | English: | EMERGENCY EVACUATION SYSTEM, AN EMERGENCY EVACUATION UNIT AND OPERATION METHOD OF SUCH SYSTEM | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉVACUATION D'URGENCE, UNITÉ D'ÉVACUATION D'URGENCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TEL SYSTÈME | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 06.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4079812 (NAKA HIROMITSU) [X] 22-25 * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 34 * * column 6, line 59 - column 11, line 42 * * figures 1-25 * [A] 1-21; | [A]WO2013034045 (ALDOSARI ASHWAN MURDHI B [CN]) [A] 1-25 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 2 ** figures 1-4 *; | [A]KR101615728B (E&H SYSTEM [KR]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0032] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0045] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0063] * * figures 2-8 * |