EP4073758 - SKELETAL TRACKING USING PREVIOUS FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snap Inc. 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSOULINE, Avihay 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | 02 /
BERGER, Itamar 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | 03 /
DUDOVITCH, Gal 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | 04 /
ZOHAR, Matan 3000 31st Street Santa Monica, California 90405 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Kramer, Dani, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20839176.3 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020US64476 | Priority number, date | US201916710980 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: US201916710980 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119408 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073758 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/73, G06T13/00, A63F13/00, G06K9/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06T7/73 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/213 (EP);
A63F13/42 (EP);
A63F13/55 (EP);
A63F13/655 (EP);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06N3/08 (KR);
G06T7/269 (KR);
G06V20/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/46 (KR,US);
G06V20/647 (KR,US);
G06V40/103 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/23 (KR,US);
H04L51/04 (KR,US);
H04N21/4402 (KR,US);
A63F2300/5553 (EP);
A63F2300/6607 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | SKELETTVERFOLGUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON VORHERGEHENDEN RAHMEN | [2022/42] | English: | SKELETAL TRACKING USING PREVIOUS FRAMES | [2022/42] | French: | SUIVI SQUELETTIQUE À L'AIDE D'IMAGES PRÉCÉDENTES | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2018225517 (HOLZER STEFAN JOHANNES JOSEF [US], et al); |