Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4079040 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080094321 EP20839496 JP2022538129 KR20227025006 US2020065268W US202017785556



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023026671Global Dossier 26.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019
WO2020US65268 16.12.2020
US202017785556 16.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20220119106Global Dossier 26.08.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019
WO2020US65268 16.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2023507782Global Dossier 27.02.2023A
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019
WO2020US65268 16.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115004769BGlobal Dossier 01.04.2025B
CN115004769 02.09.2022A
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019
WO2020US65268 16.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4079040Global Dossier 26.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019
WO2020US65268 16.12.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021126948Global Dossier 24.06.2021A1
Priority number Date
US201962951377 20.12.2019