EP4001404 - VIRUS AND TUMOR THERAPEUTIC DRUG FOR SPECIFICALLY KILLING TUMOR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wu, Zetang No. 30 Hongfeng Road High-tech Development Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bamberger Straße 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20839589.7 | 04.06.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020CN94435 | Priority number, date | CN201910644539 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910644539 | [2022/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008267 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001404 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/01, C12N15/57, A61K35/763, A61K35/768, A61P35/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
C12N7/00 (CN);
A61K48/0058 (US);
A61K35/76 (CN);
A61K35/761 (US);
A61K35/763 (EP,CN);
A61K48/0066 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/113 (CN);
C12N2710/16632 (EP);
C12N2710/16643 (EP);
C12N2830/008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VIRUS- UND TUMORTHERAPEUTIKUM ZUR GEZIELTEN ABTÖTUNG VON TUMORZELLEN | [2022/21] | English: | VIRUS AND TUMOR THERAPEUTIC DRUG FOR SPECIFICALLY KILLING TUMOR CELLS | [2022/21] | French: | MÉDICAMENT THÉRAPEUTIQUE CONTRE LE VIRUS ET LES TUMEURS POUR TUER SPÉCIFIQUEMENT DES CELLULES TUMORALES | [2022/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2022 | Translation filed | 24.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 05.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN101781636 (EASTERN HEPATOBILIARY SURGERY) [X] 1-4,8,10,11 * page 5 - page 8; figure 1 * [A] 5-7 [I] 9; | [XA]US2015071881 (BONASTRE RAMON ALEMANY [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10,11 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0057]; claims 5-10 *[A] 3-7,9 | International search | [XY]WO0170175 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 8, 10-16 * see claims 1-6, 17-20 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [XY]CN1884556 (JIANGSU SHUNTANG BIOENGINEERIN [CN]) [X] 1-4, 8, 10-16 * see abstract, description, page 4, last paragraph to page 5, first paragraph, and page 11, embodiment 1 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [XY]CN101781636 (EASTERN HEPATOBILIARY SURGERY) [X] 1-4, 8, 10-16 * see claims 1-8 and 12 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [XY]WO2012003287 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 8, 10-16 * see claims 10-16 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [XY]CN108135934 (COLD GENESYS INC) [X] 1-2, 8, 10-13, 15-16 * see claims 1-8, 19-25 and 42 * [Y] 5-7,9; | [PX]CN110684743 (WU ZETANG) [PX] 1-16 * see claims 1-13 and description paragraphs 20-22 *; | [AX] - JC Doloff , DJ Waxman, "Dual E1A Oncolytic Adenovirus: Targeting Tumor Heterogeneity With Two Independent Cancer-specific Promoter Elements, DF3/MUC1 and hTERT", Cancer Gene Therapy, (20110301), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1038/cgt.2010.52, ISSN 0929-1903, pages 153 - 166, XP055017520 [A] 3-9, 14 * pages 153-166, see abstract * [X] 1-2,10-13,15-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cgt.2010.52 | [A] - Zhonglin Cai Haidi Lv Wenjuan Cao Chuan Zhou Qiangzhao Liu Hui Li , Fenghai Zhou, "Targeting strategies of adenovirus‑mediated gene therapy and virotherapy for prostate cancer", Molecular medicine reports, (20170913), vol. 16, no. 5, doi:10.3892/mmr.2017.7487, ISSN 1791-3004, pages 6443 - 6458, XP055773449 [A] 1-16 * pp. 6443-6458, see entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/mmr.2017.7487 |