EP4000582 - DEVICE FOR CARDIO-PULMONARY RESUSCITATION OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diseño y Producción de Sistemas Rcp S.L. C/ la Luna nº 11 22081 Gurrea de Gallego Huesca / ES | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERRERO LINDLAU, Adolfo 22081 Gurrea de Gallego (Huesca) / ES | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Ibarra Garcia, Isabel PADIMA Explanada de España 11,1° 03002 Alicante / ES | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20839647.3 | 13.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020ES70454 | Priority number, date | ES20190031210U | 15.07.2019 Original published format: ES 201931210 U | [2022/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021009403 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000582 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4000582 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, // A61H31/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP);
A61H31/00 (KR);
A61H31/004 (US);
A61G13/12 (KR);
A61G13/121 (US);
A61G13/1235 (US);
A61H31/008 (KR,US);
A62B7/02 (KR,US);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | A61M16/06, A61H31/00, A61G13/12 | ||
Former IPC [2022/21] | A61H31/00, A61G13/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERZ-LUNGEN-WIEDERBELEBUNG EINES PATIENTEN | [2022/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR CARDIO-PULMONARY RESUSCITATION OF A PATIENT | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA RÉANIMATION CARDIOPULMONAIRE D'UN PATIENT | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2022 | Translation filed | 03.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 20.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN203634611U (ZHAO XUYANG); | [A]CN104474622 (JIANYANG CITY PEOPLE S HOSPITAL); | [A]CN107343977 (LIU XINZHU) | International search | [A]US3461858 (MICHELSON IRVING); | [A]US4196725 (GUNDERSON ARTHUR M [US]); | [A]US4297999 (KITRELL JOHN V); | [A]US2005085799 (LURIA ODED [IL], et al); | [A]US2016338904 (LURIE KEITH G [US], et al); | [A]WO2017066770 (KEITH G LURIE [US]); | [A]US2018133103 (LURIE KEITH G [US]); | [A]WO2018129024 (COWBOY EMS LLC [US]) |