EP3999255 - SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR COOPERATIVE CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lionsbot International Pte. Ltd. 11 Changi South Street 3, 03-02 Singapore 486122 / SG | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Dylan, Terntzer c/o Lionsbot International PTE. LTD. 11 Changi South Street 3, 03-02, Singapore 486122 / SG | 02 /
ELARA, Mohan Rajesh c/o Lionsbot International PTE. LTD. 11 Changi South Street 3, 03-02, Singapore 486122 / SG | 03 /
PATHMAKUMAR, Thejus c/o Lionsbot International PTE. LTD. 11 Changi South Street 3, 03-02, Singapore 486122 / SG | 04 /
TAY, Sunardi c/o Lionsbot International PTE. LTD. 11 Changi South Street 3, 03-02, Singapore 486122 / SG | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20839893.3 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020SG50409 | Priority number, date | SG20191006555P | 15.07.2019 Original published format: SG10201906555P | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010899 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999255 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B08B13/00, A47L11/40, G05B19/04, G06Q10/0631 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A47L11/4011 (EP,US);
A47L1/02 (US);
A47L11/4061 (EP);
A47L9/2836 (US);
A47L9/2894 (US);
B08B13/00 (EP);
G05D1/0297 (EP);
G06Q10/0631 (EP);
A47L2201/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | B08B13/00, A47L11/40, G05B19/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOOPERATIVEN REINIGUNG | [2022/21] | English: | SYSTEM AND APPARATUS FOR COOPERATIVE CLEANING | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE COOPÉRATIF | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SG | 11.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011082717 (SAAD EMAD WILLIAM [US], et al); | [IY]US2012165978 (LI SHEN-CHUN [TW], et al); | [XY]US2018300676 (PETERSON KEVIN [US], et al); | International search | [X]US2016342157 (AMMAR PHILIP GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]CN107981788 (GUANGDONG ICLEAN ROBOT INTELLIGENT EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [A]US2018157266 (XIE YAN [CN]); | [X]WO2019124913 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) | by applicant | US2011082717 | US2012165978 | US20180300676 |