EP3997016 - NOVEL CHAIN LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanchard, Kenneth 2024 N. Neiner Road Sanford MI 48654 / US | For all designated states Duperon, Terry L. 5693 Becker Rd. Saginaw, MI 48601 / US | For all designated states Funchion, Bryce 9681 Elms Road Tecumseh MI 48603 / US | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20840329.5 | 10.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020US41562 | Priority number, date | US201916509968 | 12.07.2019 Original published format: US201916509968 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021011361 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3997016 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/10, F16G13/07 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
F16G13/07 (EP);
F16G13/18 (US);
F16G13/20 (EP);
F16G15/12 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/19] | B65G17/08, F16G13/10, B65G17/38, F16G13/07, B65G17/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES KETTENGLIED | [2022/19] | English: | NOVEL CHAIN LINK | [2022/19] | French: | NOUVEAU MAILLON DE CHAÎNE | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 07.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2022 | Decision despatched | 07.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2024 | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1092189 (LIEBRANDT KARL); | [IA]KR20180001304 (SHIN MU HYUN [KR]) | International search | [A]GB380959 (VICTOR IRON WORKS INC); | [A]US2000499 (JOHN ROLAND ROBERT); | [A]US2619843 (KAMPFER CHARLES W); | [A]US4150584 (THEIJSMEIJER FREDERIK [US]); | [A]US4979929 (HYNES ROBERT [US]); | [A]US5771676 (KOMIYA SHOICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US6250459 (COEN DANIELE [IT], et al); | [A]US6814223 (VERDIGETS CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al); | [A]US2015027943 (BERNIER TAMMY [US], et al); | [A]US9707496 (DUPERON TERRY L [US], et al) | by applicant | US9707496 | KR20180001304 |