EP3998274 - PREPARATION METHOD FOR SAMPLE TO BE ANALYZED, ANALYSIS METHOD, AND KIT FOR PREPARATION OF SAMPLE TO BE ANALYZED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMADZU CORPORATION 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara-cho Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAZE, Takashi c/o SHIMADZU CORPORATION, 1, Nishinokyo-Kuwabara- cho, Nakagyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 604-8511 / JP | 02 /
FURUKAWA, Jun-ichi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HOKKAIDO UNIVERSITY, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | 03 /
HANAMATSU, Hisatoshi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION HOKKAIDO UNIVERSITY, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20840389.9 | 06.07.2020 | [2022/20] | WO2020JP26489 | Priority number, date | JP20190130188 | 12.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019130188 | [2022/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010221 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3998274 | Date: | 18.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/14, C07K1/16, G01N27/62, C08B37/00, G01N1/28, G01N30/06, G01N30/72, G01N30/88 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C08B37/006 (EP,US);
G01N30/06 (CN,US);
G01N1/28 (CN,US);
G01N27/62 (CN,US);
G01N30/72 (US);
G01N30/88 (US);
G01N33/50 (EP);
C07K1/003 (EP,US);
G01N2030/067 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINER ZU ANALYSIERENDEN PROBE, ANALYSEVERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZU ANALYSIERENDEN PROBE | [2022/19] | English: | PREPARATION METHOD FOR SAMPLE TO BE ANALYZED, ANALYSIS METHOD, AND KIT FOR PREPARATION OF SAMPLE TO BE ANALYZED | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON À ANALYSER, PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE ET KIT POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON À ANALYSER | [2022/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2022 | Translation filed | 09.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/20] | 06.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3279655 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15* claims 1, 8, 12, 13 * | International search | [X]WO2016159291 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [X] 1, 3-4, 6-18 * paragraphs [0031]-[0041], [0046]-[0058], [0063]-[0068] *; | [PA]JP2019152475 (SHIMADZU CORP) [PA] 1-18* paragraphs [0022], [0032]-[0035], [0038]-[0039], [0046]-[0048], [0063] *; | [PA]JP2020030182 (SHIMADZU CORP) [PA] 1-18 * paragraphs [0016]-[0024], [0029]-[0033], [0036], [0044]-[0046], [0050]-[0053], [0057] *; | [PA]JP2020056727 (SHIMADZU CORP) [PA] 1-18 * paragraphs [0023]-[0040] *; | [A] - HANAMATSU, HISATOSHI, "Sialic Acid Linkage Specific Derivatization of Glycosphingolipid Glycans by Ring-Opening Aminolysis of Lactones", Anal. Chem, (20181017), vol. 90, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.8b02775, pages 13193 - 13199, XP055654558 [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.8b02775 | [A] - NISHIKAZE, TAKASHI, "Differentiation of Sialyl Linkage Isomers by One-Pot Sialic Acid Derivatization for Mass Spectrometry-Based Glycan Profiling", Anal. Chem., (20170124), vol. 89, doi:10.1021/acs.analchem.6b0 4I50, pages 2353 - 2360, XP055660957 [A] 1-18 * entire text, all drawings * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.analchem.6b04150 | by applicant | JPS6135710B | JP2019130188 | - "Differentiation of Sialyl Linkage Isomers by One-Pot Sialic Acid Derivatization for Mass Spectrometry-Based Glycan Profiling", NISHIKAZE TTSUMOTO HSEKIYA SIWAMOTO SMIURA YTANAKA K, Analytical Chemistry, ACS Publications, (20170221), vol. 89, pages 2353 - 2360 | - "Sialic Acid Linkage Specific Derivatization of Glycosphingolipid Glycans by Ring-Opening Aminolysis of Lactones", HANAMATSU HNISHIKAZE TMIURA NPIAO JOKADA KSEKIYA SIWAMOTO SSAKAMOTO NTANAKA KFURUKAWA JI, Analytical Chemistry, (USA, ACS Publications, (20181029), vol. 90, pages 13193 - 13199 | - TAKASHI NISHIKAZESADANORI SEKIYASHINICHI IWAMOTOKOICHI TANAKA, "A Universal Approach to linkage-Specific Derivatization for Sialic Acids on Glycopeptides", Journal of The American Society for Mass Spectrometry, (20170600), vol. 28, XP055782279 |