EP3881543 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Xiaozhong c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
LIU, Shan c/o TENCENT AMERICA LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20840457.4 | 14.07.2020 | [2021/38] | WO2020US41965 | Priority number, date | US201962875327P | 17.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962875327 P | US202016927200 | 13.07.2020 Original published format: US202016927200 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021011555 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881543 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/139, H04N19/184, H04N19/119 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/119 (EP);
H04N19/96 (US);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (US);
H04N19/463 (EP);
H04N19/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | H04N19/139, H04N19/184 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2021/38] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VIDEO CODING | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE VIDÉO | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 30.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008304569 (LEE KYO-HYUK [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2018141416 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [Y]US2019104312 (LIM JAEHYUN [KR], et al) | International search | [A]US2013279820 (COHEN ROBERT A [US], et al); | [A]WO2017123980 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]WO2018141416 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [Y]US2019104312 (LIM JAEHYUN [KR], et al) |