EP3999703 - A HINGE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humanihut Pty Ltd Level 1 290 Glen Osmond Road Fullarton SA 5063 / AU | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTON, Neale C/- Humanihut Pty Ltd Level 1 290 Glen Osmond Road Fullarton, South Australia 5063 / AU | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20840489.7 | 30.06.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020AU00058 | Priority number, date | AU20190206038 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: AU 2019206038 | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007607 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999703 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05D1/00, E04B1/343, B65D88/52, E04B1/344, E05D1/02, E04B1/61 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
E05D1/02 (EP,US);
E04B1/3445 (EP,AU,US);
B65D88/522 (US);
E04B1/6158 (EP);
E05D7/009 (AU);
B65D11/00 (AU);
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | E05D1/00, E04B1/343, B65D88/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | SCHARNIERVERBINDUNG | [2022/21] | English: | A HINGE JOINT | [2022/21] | French: | ARTICULATION À CHARNIÈRE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5129441 (LEIST ALAN R [US], et al); | [Y]CN205557920U (WANHUA MODULAR PROJECTS CO LTD) | International search | [X]US2210652 (DEVON DENNETT); | [X]US2912049 (KUYPER HERMAN S); | [Y]US4214669 (MCQUISTON WILLIAM W [US]); | [XY]US5129441 (LEIST ALAN R [US], et al); | [X]SE524090 (INNOVATION DEV ENTPR I STOCKHO [SE]); | [XY]KR20140003906 (YOU JAE SANG [KR]); | [X]US9169633 (DIGREGORY VINCENT J [US]); | [PX]WO2019155122 (INTLOG OY [FI]); | by applicant | US5129441 | AU2019206038 |