Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11629101 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2023 | B2 | US2022204411 | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP27900 | 17.07.2020 | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220035124 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP27900 | 17.07.2020 | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7019093B | Global Dossier | 14.02.2022 | B2 | JPWO2021010473 | 13.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP27900 | 17.07.2020 | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114096502B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | B | CN114096502 | 25.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP27900 | 17.07.2020 | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4000778 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2022 | A4 | EP4000778 | 25.05.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP27900 | 17.07.2020 | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021010473 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019133024 | 18.07.2019 |