EP3993527 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Lei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xuelong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Bingzhao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Hong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20841034.0 | 02.07.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020CN100003 | Priority number, date | CN201910647484 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: CN201910647484 | [2022/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021008381 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3993527 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00, H04W8/26, H04L61/5053 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H04W68/00 (EP);
H04W68/005 (CN,US);
H04L61/5053 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W76/11 (CN);
H04W8/183 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | H04W68/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2022/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2022 | Translation filed | 28.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013303203 (WANG GUANZHOU [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [ 123] - [0125] - [ 164] - [0169] - [ 181] - [0192]; figure 3 *; | [XI]EP2737762 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0 18] , [0 41] , [0 46] , [0 57] , [0 66] , [0 68]; figures 2,3 * [I] 4,7,11; | [A]WO2018176219 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] - [0 46] , [0 53] - [0058] - [ 101] - [0106]; figure 9 *; | [XP] - INTEL ET AL, "Solution for Paging Reception with PO collision avoidance", vol. SA WG2, no. Reno, NV, US; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191115), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1911942, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_136_Reno/Docs/S2-1911942.zip S2-1911942_was1097_FS_MUSIM_23761_Sol_Paging_Reception v5.doc, (20191115), XP051825715 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * |