EP4001423 - BIOSURFACTANT-PRODUCING RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 13-1, Umeda 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5300001 / JP | |||
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOBO CO., LTD. 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Tomotake c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 02 /
SAIKA, Azusa c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 03 /
KOIKE, Hideaki c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 04 /
FUKUOKA, Tokuma c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 05 /
KITAMOTO, Dai c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-Chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 06 /
SUGAHARA, Tomohiro c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD., 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-8550 / JP | 07 /
YAMAMOTO, Shuhei c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD., 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | 08 /
SOGABE, Atsushi c/o TOYOBO CO., LTD., 2-8, Dojima Hama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20841145.4 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020JP26760 | Priority number, date | JP20190133055 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019133055 | [2022/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010264 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001423 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/44, C12N1/19, C12N15/81 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/20 (EP,CN,US);
C12P19/44 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/39 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12Y301/01003 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | BIOTENSID PRODUZIERENDER REKOMBINANTER MIKROORGANISMUS | [2022/21] | English: | BIOSURFACTANT-PRODUCING RECOMBINANT MICROORGANISM | [2022/21] | French: | MICROORGANISMES RECOMBINANT DE PRODUCTION DE BIOSURFACTANT | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2022 | Translation filed | 19.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007185142 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [Y]WO2012146937 (FRITO LAY TRADING CO GMBH [CH], et al); | International search | [A]JP2011182740 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN); | [X]WO2017208791 (AIST [JP], et al); | [A]JP2018113946 (AIST, et al); |