EP4002877 - VOICE CONTROL DEVICE AND VOICE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAKI Junji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ABE Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
YAMAGUCHI Takahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KUBOTA Kenichi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20841254.4 | 14.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020JP27376 | Priority number, date | JP20190131955 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019131955 | [2022/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010397 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4002877 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/14, G10K11/178 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G10K11/17881 (EP);
G10L21/0232 (US);
G10K11/17827 (EP);
G10K11/17885 (EP);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04R3/12 (US);
H04R3/14 (EP,US);
G10K11/178 (US);
G10K2210/1281 (EP);
G10K2210/3046 (EP);
G10K2210/3221 (EP);
G10L2015/223 (US);
H04R2203/12 (EP);
H04R2410/05 (EP);
H04R2499/13 (EP);
H04S2420/13 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | H04R1/40, H04R3/00, H04R3/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | SPRACHSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SPRACHSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/21] | English: | VOICE CONTROL DEVICE AND VOICE CONTROL SYSTEM | [2022/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE VOCALE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2022 | Translation filed | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2014093096 (SHEEN TIMOTHY W [US], et al); | [A]US2016105742 (GAUTAMA TEMUJIN [BE]) | International search | [XY]JP2008271067 (SONY CORP); | [Y]US2019014430 (CHRISTOPH MARKUS [DE]) | by applicant | JP2017050847 |