EP4000625 - COMPOSITION FOR REGENERATING GROWTH PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajou University Industry-Academic Cooperation Foundation Woncheon-dong 206 World cup-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16499 / KR | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Byoung-Hyun 201-802, 34, Burim-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14101 / KR | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Roos, Peter c/o Roospatent Noldinstrasse 7 81545 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20841437.5 | 13.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020KR09179 | Priority number, date | KR20190086412 | 17.07.2019 Original published format: KR 20190086412 | [2022/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021010702 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000625 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/32, A61K38/39, A61K31/726, A61K31/711, A61K9/00, A61P19/02, A61L27/36, A61L27/20 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/711 (EP,KR);
A61K35/32 (EP,KR);
A61L27/3612 (KR,US);
A61K31/726 (EP,KR);
A61K38/39 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61K9/06 (KR);
A61L27/20 (KR);
A61L27/24 (KR,US);
A61L27/26 (EP);
A61L27/3633 (EP,US);
A61L27/3654 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/3817 (EP);
A61L27/3852 (EP);
A61L27/52 (EP);
A61L27/54 (US);
A61L27/58 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/711, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/726, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61L27/26, C08L5/08 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR REGENERIERUNG VON WACHSTUMSPLATTEN | [2022/21] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR REGENERATING GROWTH PLATE | [2022/21] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA RÉGÉNÉRATION D'UNE PLAQUE DE CROISSANCE | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | Translation filed | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]KR20100005105 (MIN BYOUNG HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-7* See abstract; and claims 1-16. *; | [Y]KR20160148499 (AJOU UNIV INDUSTRY-ACADEMIC COOP FOUND [KR]) [Y] 1-7 * See abstract; and claims 1-4. *; | [A]KR20180015041 (UNIV AJOU IND ACADEMIC COOP FOUND [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See abstract; and claims 1-7. *; | [A]WO2019094389 (UNIV COLORADO REGENTS [US]) [A] 1-7 * See abstract; and claim 1. *; | [Y] - Melrose James; Shu Cindy; Whitelock John M.; Lord Megan S., "The cartilage extracellular matrix as a transient developmental scaffold for growth plate maturation", Matrix Biology, Elsevier, NL, NL, (20160123), vol. 52, doi:10.1016/j.matbio.2016.01.008, ISSN 0945-053X, pages 363 - 383, XP029544404 [Y] 1-7 * See abstract; and page 372. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matbio.2016.01.008 |