EP4000022 - ORGANIZATION FRAMEWORK FOR NON-FUNCTIONAL REQUIREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 1230604 BC LTD. 1 Yonge Street Suite 1801 Toronto, ON M5E 1W7 / CA | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHALLA, Nischal 1413 Glenburnie Road Mississauga, Ontario L5G 3C7 / CA | 02 /
SETHI, Rohit Kumar 252 Windermere Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6S 3K3 / CA | 03 /
SIVARANJAN, Ramanan 209 Perth Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6P 3X7 / CA | 04 /
FOROUGHI, Ehsan 62 Newton Drive Toronto, Ontario M2M 2M9 / CA | 05 /
WHITTINGTON, Geoffrey Charles 610 Sandringham Drive Waterloo, Ontario N2K 3L9 / CA | 06 /
MONTOPOLI, Leta 828 Broadview Ave, Rear Unit Toronto, Ontario M4K 2P7 / CA | 07 /
THAM, Emin 15678 77B AVE Surrey, British Columbia V3S 3P9 / CA | 08 /
VIRANI, Hanif 565 Avenue Road, Apt 306 Toronto, Ontario M4V 2J9 / CA | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20841556.2 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020CA50994 | Priority number, date | US201962875591P | 18.07.2019 Original published format: US 201962875591 P | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021007679 | Date: | 21.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000022 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 21.01.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06F8/10 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06313 (EP,US);
G06Q10/103 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | ORGANISATIONSRAHMEN FÜR NICHT-FUNKTIONELLE ANFORDERUNGEN | [2022/21] | English: | ORGANIZATION FRAMEWORK FOR NON-FUNCTIONAL REQUIREMENTS | [2022/21] | French: | STRUCTURE ORGANISATIONNELLE POUR EXIGENCES NON FONCTIONNELLES | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003120578 (NEWMAN PETER [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0141]; figures 6-23 *; | [I]US2004255265 (BROWN WILLIAM M [US], et al) [I] 1-16* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-9 *; | [I]US2010198642 (NADKARNI GAUTAM [IN], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0060] *; | [I]US2014067448 (JOSHI ARUSHI SOOD [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0092] *; | [XI]US2018114169 (WIIG REX [US], et al) [X] 1,11,16 * paragraph [0034]; figures 5B1-5F1,29E; claim 1 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0141] * * paragraph [0227] * * paragraph [0256] * * paragraph [0316] * [I] 2-10,12-15; | [I]WO2019032964 (INFRONT COMPLIANCE INC [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0058]; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US6615166 (GUHEEN MICHAEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-20*the entire document*; | [X]US2007094284 (BRADFORD TERESA A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 *the entre document, especially paragraphs 11, 28-33; figures 1a-1c*; | [A]US2014095623 (WIIG REX [US], et al) [A] 1-20 *the entire document* |