Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023036951 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019219928 | 17.12.2019 | WO2020EP86905 | 17.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3162376 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019219928 | 17.12.2019 | WO2020EP86905 | 17.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4057826 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | C0 | EP4057826 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2024 | B1 | EP4057826 | 21.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019219928 | 17.12.2019 | WO2020EP86905 | 17.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021123077 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019219928 | 17.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102019219928 | 17.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019219928 | 17.12.2019 |