Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4076292 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202080087490 EP2020087066W EP20842567 EP23202257 US202017787554



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2022401233Global Dossier 22.12.2022A1
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
WO2020EP87066 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4279034Global Dossier 21.02.2024A3
EP4279034 22.11.2023A2
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
EP20842567 18.12.2020
WO2020EP87066 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN114828786Global Dossier 29.07.2022A
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
WO2020EP87066 18.12.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4076292Global Dossier 11.10.2023B1
EP4076292 26.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
WO2020EP87066 18.12.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021123199Global Dossier 24.06.2021A1
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102019135544 24.06.2021A1
Priority number Date
DE102019135544 20.12.2019
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4279034