EP4085105 - HYDROPHOBIC, LOW GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE OLIGOMER WITH HIGH LEVEL OF CHAIN TRANSFER AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benjamin Moore & Co. 101 Paragon Drive Montvale, NJ 07645 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASTENA, Gianna 10 Ramar Street Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | 02 /
MUNOZ, Brian 677 Selfmaster Parkway Union, NJ 07083 / US | 03 /
GHARAPETIAN, Hrire 324 Kenilworth Road Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | 04 /
PENNY, Thomas 3 Elm Street Newton, NJ 07860 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/45] | Kiwit, Benedikt Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20842605.6 | 09.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US63918 | Priority number, date | US201962954906P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962954906 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138008 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085105 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4085105 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D17/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
C09D17/00 (EP,KR);
C09D7/65 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR,US);
C08K3/04 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR,US);
C08K3/28 (KR,US);
C09D17/002 (US);
C09D17/004 (US);
C08K2003/2265 (KR,US);
C08K3/013 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | C09D5/00, C09D7/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROPHOBES OLIGOMER MIT NIEDRIGER GLASÜBERGANGSTEMPERATUR UND HOHEM GEHALT AN EINEM KETTENTRANFERMITTEL | [2022/45] | English: | HYDROPHOBIC, LOW GLASS TRANSITION TEMPERATURE OLIGOMER WITH HIGH LEVEL OF CHAIN TRANSFER AGENT | [2022/45] | French: | OLIGOMÈRE HYDROPHOBE À FAIBLE TEMPÉRATURE DE TRANSITION VITREUSE AYANT UN NIVEAU ÉLEVÉ D'AGENT DE TRANSFERT DE CHAÎNE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 18.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 31.01.2024 | |
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 30.04.2024 | |
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004019141 (BASTELBERGER THOMAS [DE], et al); | [X]WO2015107163 (NUPLEX RESINS BV [NL]); | [X]WO2016176394 (CHEMOURS CO TT LLC [US]); | [X]WO2019067398 (ARKEMA INC [US]) |